Global Patent Index - EP 1070151 A1

EP 1070151 A1 2001-01-24 - POSITIONING ARM FOR POSITIONING AND ASSEMBLING SYSTEMS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING POSITIONING ARMS

Title (en)

POSITIONING ARM FOR POSITIONING AND ASSEMBLING SYSTEMS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING POSITIONING ARMS

Title (de)

POSITIONIERARM FÜR POSITIONIER- UND BESTÜCKSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POSITIONIERARMEN

Title (fr)

BRAS DE POSITIONNEMENT POUR SYSTEMES DE POSITIONNEMENT ET D'EQUIPEMENT ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE BRAS DE POSITIONNEMENT

Publication

EP 1070151 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99917748 A

Priority

  • DE 9900438 W
  • DE 19811612 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19811612C1] Positioning arms (1) for positioning and assembling systems are subjected to high accelerations and must therefore be designed so as to be lightweight but resistant to bending and twisting. Positioning arms (1) which are lightweight although very resistant can be obtained through the use of composite materials made of metallic or ceramic foams and non expanded materials for positioning arms (1) in positioning and assembling systems. Semi-finished products (5) are placed in a non expanded material where linking between the semi-finished product (5) and the material (1) is better than in the metallic or ceramic foam.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 1/08; B32B 5/18; B32B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25J 18/00 (2006.01); B22D 17/00 (2006.01); B22D 19/00 (2006.01); B22F 7/00 (2006.01); B32B 5/18 (2006.01); B32B 15/02 (2006.01); C22C 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 7/006 (2013.01); B22D 19/16 (2013.01); B22D 25/005 (2013.01); C22C 21/00 (2013.01); B22F 2999/00 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12479 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12486 (2013.01); Y10T 428/249956 (2015.04)

Combination set (CPC)

B22F 2999/00 + B22F 7/004 + B22F 3/1125

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947717A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19811612 C1 19990225; CN 1293715 A 20010502; EP 1070151 A1 20010124; EP 1070151 B1 20030502; JP 2002506744 A 20020305; US 6428907 B1 20020806; WO 9947717 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100217

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100217

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100217

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-09-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100901

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090505

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090217

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090216

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905334 P 20030605

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010201

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000816

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL