Global Patent Index - EP 1070152 A1

EP 1070152 A1 2001-01-24 - TiAl BASE ALLOY

Title (en)

TiAl BASE ALLOY

Title (de)

TiAl-BASISLEGIERUNG

Title (fr)

PREALLIAGE DE TiAl

Publication

EP 1070152 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99913284 A

Priority

  • DE 19812444 A
  • EP 9901868 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19812444A1] The invention relates to a TiAl base alloy, where the titanium aluminide contains between 42 and 54 atomic % Al, the rest being titanium, and to which as much as 12 atomic %, in relation to the TiAl, of other alloy elements can be added. The invention is characterized in that the alloy contains between 0.1 and 5 atomic % copper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 14/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 14/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 14/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949090A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19812444 A1 19990930; DE 19812444 B4 20040219; AT 260996 T 20040315; AU 3146799 A 19991018; EP 1070152 A1 20010124; EP 1070152 B1 20040303; WO 9949090 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100320

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100320

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100320

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100320

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090323

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090323

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-12-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040727

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT FR GB IT

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT FR GB IT

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020701

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000930

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT