Global Patent Index - EP 1070157 A1

EP 1070157 A1 2001-01-24 - METHOD FOR REMOVING PHOTORESIST AND PLASMA ETCH RESIDUES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REMOVING PHOTORESIST AND PLASMA ETCH RESIDUES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON PHOTORESIST- UND PLASMAÄTZRÜCKSTÄNDEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE RETIRER UN PHOTORESIST ET DES RESIDUS DE GRAVURE AU PLASMA

Publication

EP 1070157 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98915347 A

Priority

US 9806907 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951796A1] A method for the removing of plasma etch residues on a substrate comprising the steps of: (i) contacting the substrate with a cleaning composition, and (ii) contacting the substrate with ozonated water. The preferred cleaning composition has a pH from 2 to 6 and comprises: (A) water; (B) at least one selected hydroxylammonium compound; and (C) at least one basic compound; and optionally (D) a chelating stabilizer; and optionally (E) a surfactant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23G 1/02; C11D 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/32 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 7/02 (2006.01); C11D 7/06 (2006.01); C11D 7/08 (2006.01); C11D 7/10 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C23G 1/02 (2006.01); C23G 1/06 (2006.01); G03F 7/42 (2006.01); H01L 21/02 (2006.01); H01L 21/311 (2006.01); H01L 21/3213 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/02071 (2013.01); C11D 3/3942 (2013.01); C11D 7/02 (2013.01); C11D 7/06 (2013.01); C11D 7/08 (2013.01); C11D 7/10 (2013.01); C11D 11/0047 (2013.01); C23G 1/061 (2013.01); G03F 7/425 (2013.01); H01L 21/31116 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951796 A1 19991014; AU 6955698 A 19991025; EP 1070157 A1 20010124; EP 1070157 A4 20030212; JP 2002510752 A 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040921

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-02-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20021230

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 23G 1/02 A

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/39 B

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 11D 7/32 B

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/30 B

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 03F 7/42 B

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01L 21/306 B

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LEON, VINCENT, G.

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HONDA, KENJI

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROTHGERY, EUGENE, F.

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001106

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE IT NL