Global Patent Index - EP 1070158 A1

EP 1070158 A1 2001-01-24 - FUSED BATH ELECTROLYSIS CELL FOR PRODUCING ALUMINIUM BY HALL-HEROULT PROCESS COMPRISING COOLING MEANS

Title (en)

FUSED BATH ELECTROLYSIS CELL FOR PRODUCING ALUMINIUM BY HALL-HEROULT PROCESS COMPRISING COOLING MEANS

Title (de)

SCHMELZFLUSSELEKTROLYSEOFEN MIT KÜHLVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON ALUMINIUM

Title (fr)

CUVE D'ELECTROLYSE IGNEE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'ALUMINIUM PAR LE PROCEDE HALL-HEROULT COMPRENANT DES MOYENS DE REFROIDISSEMENT

Publication

EP 1070158 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99911893 A

Priority

  • FR 9900802 W
  • FR 9805040 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2777574A1] Electrolysis comprises a steel caisson, some inner coating elements and a cathode assembly. The cell incorporates cooling system that blows localized jets of air distributed around the caisson, advantageously at a variable rate, to allow the evacuation and dissipation of the thermal energy generated in the electrolysis cell. An Independent claim is given for an aluminum production unit incorporating these electrolysis cells, in which the cooling system is applied individually or in common with two or more such cells.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25C 3/06; C25C 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25C 3/06 (2006.01); C25C 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25C 3/06 (2013.01); C25C 3/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954526A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2777574 A1 19991022; FR 2777574 B1 20000519; AR 026090 A1 20030129; AU 3041999 A 19991108; AU 746349 B2 20020418; BR 9909613 A 20001212; BR 9909613 B1 20100713; CA 2328768 A1 19991028; CA 2328768 C 20051011; DE 69911758 D1 20031106; DE 69911758 T2 20040729; EG 21924 A 20020430; EP 1070158 A1 20010124; EP 1070158 B1 20031001; EP 1070158 B2 20090805; ES 2209412 T3 20040616; ES 2209412 T5 20091106; GC 0000048 A 20040630; IS 2692 B 20101115; IS 5655 A 20001011; NO 20005174 A 20001130; NO 20005174 D0 20001013; NO 328847 B1 20100531; RU 2201476 C2 20030327; SI 1070158 T1 20040430; SI 1070158 T2 20091030; SK 15332000 A3 20010510; SK 285426 B6 20070104; US 6251237 B1 20010626; WO 9954526 A1 19991028; ZA 200005405 B 20010829

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161104

2017-02-02 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20090402716

- Effective date: 20161104

2017-01-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20161227

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160407

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160501

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160407

2016-12-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160501

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150429

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150426

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-21 [REG DE R124] RE-ESTABLISHMENT DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69911758

2013-12-17 [REG DE R124] RE-ESTABLISHMENT DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69911758

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-30 [REG DE R073] RE-ESTABLISHMENT REQUESTED

- Document: DE 69911758

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091106

2010-01-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20090402716

2009-11-06 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2009-11-02 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2009-10-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20090805

2009-08-05 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20090805

2009-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR NL

2009-08-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: RO SI

2006-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ALUMINIUM PECHINEY

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALUMINIUM PECHINEY

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: NORSK HYDRO ASA

2004-08-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: NORSK HYDRO ASA

- Effective date: 20040624

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209412 T3

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040115

2004-02-02 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030405098

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69911758 P 20031106

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR NL

2003-10-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: RO SI

2003-10-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001024

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR NL

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20001024;SI PAYMENT 20001024