Global Patent Index - EP 1070163 B1

EP 1070163 B1 2002-09-04 - DRIVE DEVICE FOR THE PARTING SHAFTS OF CIRCULAR LOOMS

Title (en)

DRIVE DEVICE FOR THE PARTING SHAFTS OF CIRCULAR LOOMS

Title (de)

ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE TEILSCHÄFTE VON RUNDWEBMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAINEMENT POUR LES LAMES PARTIELLES DE METIERS A TISSER CIRCULAIRES

Publication

EP 1070163 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936242 A

Priority

  • DE 9901343 W
  • DE 19815821 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951805A2] The invention relates to a drive device for the parting shafts of circular looms on which the parting shafts are driven in pairs in opposite directions. Lower band sections are assigned to the parting shafts of each pair. A drive lever which oscillates around a bearing fixed to the frame is connected to said band sections via a coupling. The drive lever comprises at least one jockey roller for interacting with a globoid cam which can be rotationally driven around the vertical axis of the circular loom. In order to reduce the number and the mass of the transmission elements having flat curve inclinations on the globoid cam, the drive device is configured such that the bearing (51; 71) of the drive lever (5; 7), said bearing being fixed to the frame, is arranged outside of the movement plane (220) of each inner parting shaft (22, 22'), and such that the jockey roller (55; 75) and each one of the couplings (52, 53; 72) are arranged on the same side of the bearing (51; 71).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 37/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951805 A2 19991014; WO 9951805 A3 19991216; AT 223526 T 20020915; AU 5147299 A 19991025; DE 19815821 C1 19991202; EP 1070163 A2 20010124; EP 1070163 B1 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-03-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR GB IT LI

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223526 T 20020915

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011129

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001024

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR GB IT LI