Global Patent Index - EP 1070171 A1

EP 1070171 A1 2001-01-24 - APPLICATION OF A LAYER OF ADMIXTURE IN THE WEB FORMER UNIT OF A BOARD MACHINE

Title (en)

APPLICATION OF A LAYER OF ADMIXTURE IN THE WEB FORMER UNIT OF A BOARD MACHINE

Title (de)

AUFTRAGEN EINER LAGE VON ZUSATZSTOFFEN IN DER BLATTBILDUNGSPARTIE EINER KARTONMASCHINE

Title (fr)

APPLICATION D'UNE COUCHE D'ADJUVANT DANS UN ENSEMBLE FORMEUR D'UNE MACHINE A CARTON

Publication

EP 1070171 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99902565 A

Priority

  • FI 9900075 W
  • FI 980287 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9940256A1] The invention concerns a method for application of a layer of admixture in the web former unit of a board machine. The flow of fresh stock (11) is divided into at least two component stock flows (121 and 122), of which flows, to at least one component flow (121), which forms a face which will be placed against the face of the layer to be combined with it, at a point (141) before the pump (22), at a point (14a2), and/or at a point (143) after the machine screen, admixtures are added in order to increase the contents of fines in the layers and the bonding strength between the faces, and after this the component flows (121 and 122) are passed into the multi-layer headbox (44) and further into the gap former.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 11/00 (2006.01); D21F 9/00 (2006.01); D21F 11/04 (2006.01); D21H 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/006 (2013.01); D21F 11/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940256A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9940256 A1 19990812; AT 277226 T 20041015; AU 2280999 A 19990823; BR 9907976 A 20001017; CA 2320199 A1 19990812; DE 69920426 D1 20041028; DE 69920426 T2 20051117; EP 1070171 A1 20010124; EP 1070171 B1 20040922; FI 103211 B1 19990514; FI 103211 B 19990514; FI 980287 A0 19980209; JP 2002502921 A 20020129

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070203

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080215

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070203

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070203

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2004-12-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69920426 P 20041028

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT SE

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030818

2001-08-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METSO PAPER, INC.

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000808

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT SE