Global patent index - EP 1070186 A1

EP 1070186 A1 2001-01-24 - DOOR LOCK OF A MOTOR VEHICLE OR THE LIKE WITH AN ELECTRIC LOCKING AID AND OPENING AID

Title (en)

DOOR LOCK OF A MOTOR VEHICLE OR THE LIKE WITH AN ELECTRIC LOCKING AID AND OPENING AID

Title (de)

KRAFTFAHRZEUGTÜRSCHLOSS O.DGL. MIT ELEKTRISCHER SCHLIESSHILFE UND ÖFFNUNGSHILFE

Title (fr)

PORTIERE DE VEHICULE OU SIMILAIRE COMPORTANT UN MECANISME AUXILIAIRE DE FERMETURE OU D'OUVERTURE

Publication

EP 1070186 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00912353 A

Priority

  • DE 0000335 W
  • DE 19904663 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19904663A1] The invention relates to a door lock of a motor vehicle or the like. Said door lock comprises a latch (2) and ratchet that keeps the latch in the pre-locking or the main locking state. The door lock also comprises an electric drive (5) for the locking aid which is switched on after the latch (2) has reached a pre-locking state. The drive (5) then shifts the latch (2) into the main locking state. The door lock also comprises an electric drive for the opening aid (10) which is switched on in order to lift and pull out the ratchet from the main locking state or the pre-locking state of the latch (2). The door lock is characterised in that a coupling of the drive for the locking latch striker (5) is provided with a mechanical coupling element (9a) which can be lifted and pulled out for decoupling by specifically actuating the electric drive for the opening aid (10). In a preferred embodiment, the voltage for the electric drive for the opening aid (10) is supplied by an auxiliary battery (17) (active electric redundancy) that is constantly recharged by means of the electric wiring (15) of the motor vehicle. The voltage for the electric drive for the locking aid (5) is directly supplied by the electric wiring (15) of the motor vehicle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/32; E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 5/00 (2006.01); B60J 5/04 (2006.01); E05B 81/20 (2014.01); E05B 81/82 (2014.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 81/14 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/20 (2013.01); E05B 81/82 (2013.01); E05B 81/14 (2013.01); E05B 81/21 (2013.01); Y10S 292/23 (2013.01); Y10S 292/43 (2013.01); Y10S 292/65 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0046472A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19904663 A1 20000817; DE 19904663 C2 20010215; EP 1070186 A1 20010124; EP 1070186 B1 20030528; ES 2200841 T3 20040316; JP 2002536568 A 20021029; US 6439623 B1 20020827; WO 0046472 A1 20000810

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160203

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160108

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160113

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50002332

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GOTTSCHALD PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI, DE

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2200841

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-02-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2003-10-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-10-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BROSE SCHLIESSSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-08-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50002332

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010212

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE