Global Patent Index - EP 1070188 A1

EP 1070188 A1 2001-01-24 - MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR STOP

Title (en)

MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR STOP

Title (de)

KRAFTWAGENTÜRFESTSTELLER

Title (fr)

ELEMENT D'ARRET POUR PORTIERES DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 1070188 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907299 A

Priority

  • DE 9900260 W
  • DE 19815981 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19815981A1] The invention relates to a motor vehicle door stop comprised of a first part which acts upon a door assembly part, a door, or a door pillar, and of a second part which acts upon another door assembly part. At least one braking and holding body (7, 9) is arranged between both parts. Said braking and holding body is acted upon by a load spring (10) which is held and supported on one of both parts. In addition, one of both parts is formed by an element (2) which can move in relation to the other part and which is arranged in a distributed manner corresponding with the intended holding positions of the doors. In addition, said element is provided with brake ramps or catching notches which interact with the braking or holding body (7, 9) which is spring loaded by the load spring (10). In order to permit a subsequent compensation of fluctuations in the braking and holding forces or to permit a subsequent alteration of the spring load acting on the braking and holding body or bodies (7, 9), the invention provides that a positionally variable support (15) for the load spring is configured on the part holding the load spring (10) which interacts directly or indirectly with the braking and holding body (7, 9) on one side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 17/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/22 (2006.01); B60J 5/04 (2006.01); E05C 17/20 (2006.01); E05C 17/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/203 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953164A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19815981 A1 19991014; AU 2712099 A 19991101; BR 9909479 A 20001219; CN 1296546 A 20010523; DE 19980633 D2 20010510; EP 1070188 A1 20010124; EP 1070188 B1 20010829; ES 2163933 T3 20020201; JP 2002511544 A 20020416; MX PA00009893 A 20020702; PT 1070188 E 20020228; WO 9953164 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050128

2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030129

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2003-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-09-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-09-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030128

2003-01-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030124

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030110

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20011120

2002-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2163933 T3

2002-01-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020118

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-01-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020102

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20011221

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-12-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-11-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900229 20011004

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PLASBERG, GUENTER

2001-08-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOFFMANN, PETER

2001-08-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIS, CHRISTIAN

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001004

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE