Global patent index - EP 1070213 A1

EP 1070213 A1 2001-01-24 - PART FOR INSTALLING LONG THIN ELEMENTS AGAINST A WALL AND TOOL FOR PLACING SAID PART

Title (en)

PART FOR INSTALLING LONG THIN ELEMENTS AGAINST A WALL AND TOOL FOR PLACING SAID PART

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES LANGGESTRECKTEN ELEMENTES AN EINER WAND, UND WERKZEUG ZUM ANBRINGEN EINER SOLCHEN ANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

PIECE D'INSTALLATION D'ELEMENTS LONGILIGNES CONTRE UNE PAROI, ET OUTIL DE MISE EN PLACE DE LADITE PIECE

Publication

EP 1070213 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99909135 A

Priority

  • FR 9804403 A
  • IB 9900563 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2777061A1] The invention concerns a part for installing (4) one or several long thin elements (2) against a wall, comprising a U-shaped link bar (10) whereof the flexible branches (20, 24) have each a series of notches (22, 26) directed outwards. Said part further comprises a base (30) having, matching each branch, an oblique through passage whereof the opening (41) is located in the surface facing the link bar and whereof the outlet (43) is located in a side surface of the base. The base surface opposite to the one facing the link bar is provided with a clip (50) for mounting the base in an orifice of the wall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16L 3/10; B25B 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 31/00 (2006.01); B25C 5/00 (2006.01); F16L 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25C 5/00 (2013.01); B25B 31/00 (2013.01); F16L 3/1058 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951904A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2777061 A1 19991008; FR 2777061 B1 20000616; AR 018830 A1 20011212; AU 2849699 A 19991025; BR 9909419 A 20010925; DE 1070213 T1 20010823; EP 1070213 A1 20010124; ES 2159499 T1 20011016; JP 2002510563 A 20020409; MA 24827 A1 19991231; TN SN99047 A1 20030403; US 6398169 B1 20020604; WO 9951904 A1 19991014

INPADOC legal status

2007-11-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1033849

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-03-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020409

2001-10-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2159499

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T1

2001-09-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCAT

2001-08-23 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2001-06-06 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBC

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000921

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT