Global patent index - EP 1070221 A1

EP 1070221 A1 2001-01-24 - BURNER, ESPECIALLY FOR HEATING INSTALLATIONS

Title (en)

BURNER, ESPECIALLY FOR HEATING INSTALLATIONS

Title (de)

BRENNER, INSBESONDERE FÜR HEIZUNGSANLAGEN

Title (fr)

BRULEUR, EN PARTICULIER POUR DES INSTALLATIONS DE CHAUFFAGE

Publication

EP 1070221 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00912345 A

Priority

  • DE 0000324 W
  • DE 19904921 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19904921A1] The invention relates to a burner, especially for heating installations, comprising a housing (20) accommodating a pore burner (10) and forms a combustion gas chamber on the outlet side for said waste gas, whereby the housing is configured as a heat exchanger and is provided with an inlet leading to the inflow side of the pore burner, whereby said inlet is for a gas/air mixture in the form of a combustible. Despite the burner's simple design, it is possible to increase the efficiency thereof by optimum utilization of radiant energy and the thermal energy of the combustion gas, whereby at least the sides of the pore burner (10) adjacent to the inflow side are surrounded by a part (30) of the housing (20) that is designed as a radiant heat exchanger and the part (40) of the housing (20) forming the combustion chamber for the emission of combustion gas accommodates a convective heat exchanger (50) or is configured as a heat exchanger and the radiant energy and heat exchangers are cross-flown by the liquid that is to be heated up.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 11/00; F23D 14/16; F24H 1/43

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/16 (2006.01); F24H 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/16 (2013.01); F24H 9/1836 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0046548A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19904921 A1 20000817; DE 19904921 C2 20001207; EP 1070221 A1 20010124; JP 2002536617 A 20021029; WO 0046548 A1 20000810

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-03-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030902

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STOSCHEK, JUERGEN

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WAIDNER, JUERGEN

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PLOTHE, MICHAEL

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BIENZLE, MARCUS

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010212

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE