Global patent index - EP 1070246 A1

EP 1070246 A1 2001-01-24 - METHOD FOR ELECTROELUTION OF A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE AND IMPLEMENTING DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR ELECTROELUTION OF A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE AND IMPLEMENTING DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ELEKTROFORETISCHEN TRENNUNG EINER BIOLOGISCHEN PROBE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ELECTRO-SEPARATION D'UN ECHANTILLON BIOLOGIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN OEUVRE

Publication

EP 1070246 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99913375 A

Priority

  • FR 9900830 W
  • FR 9804878 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2777293A1] The invention concerns a method for treating by the action of an electric field in liquid medium a biological sample comprising both a nucleic material and a non-nucleic material, which consists in: a) providing a buffer solution; b) providing a permeable membrane, in contact on one side with the buffer solution, and having a predetermined interrupting threshold to stop the nucleic material, on said buffer solution side, when it is migrating under the action of the electric field; c) generating said electric field; d) placing the biological sample in the buffer solution, upstream of the membrane, along the nucleic material circulating direction by the electric field action. The invention is characterised in that it consists in: directly applying the electric field to the biological sample in the buffer solution, for a limited time interval determined by sufficient time for the nucleic material to arrive on the membrane and by its presence on the buffer solution side, and by the fact that at said time interval end the non-nucleic material has not migrated and/or is still in the process of migrating towards said membrane; removing the nucleic material after said time interval, and thereby electroeluting from the biological sample at least the nucleic material. The invention also concerns the implementing device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 27/447; G01N 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/447 (2006.01); B01D 57/02 (2006.01); B01D 61/14 (2006.01); C02F 1/469 (2006.01); C12M 1/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/06 (2006.01); C12N 15/10 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 1/066 (2013.01); B01D 57/02 (2013.01); C12N 15/1003 (2013.01); C12N 15/1017 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6806 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C12Q 1/6806 + C12Q 2523/307

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953304A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2777293 A1 19991015; FR 2777293 B1 20000519; AU 3151899 A 19991101; AU 745247 B2 20020314; CA 2328298 A1 19991021; EP 1070246 A1 20010124; JP 2002511583 A 20020416; WO 9953304 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021015

2002-02-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: USE OF A METHOD OF ELECTROPHORETIC SEPARATION OF A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE

2002-02-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: USE OF A METHOD OF ELECTROPHORETIC SEPARATION OF A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010619

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001016

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE