Global patent index - EP 1070304 A1

EP 1070304 A1 2001-01-24 - MECHANICAL MOUNTS AND ELECTRICAL CONNECTIONS FOR GAMING MACHINES

Title (en)

MECHANICAL MOUNTS AND ELECTRICAL CONNECTIONS FOR GAMING MACHINES

Title (de)

MECHANISCHER BEFESTIGUNGEN UND ELEKTRISCHE VERBINDUNG FÜR SPIELMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

SUPPORTS MECANIQUES ET/OU CONNECTEURS ELECTRIQUES DESTINES A DES MACHINES A SOUS

Publication

EP 1070304 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99907777 A

Priority

  • GB 9900746 W
  • GB 9805434 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9948067A1] An assembly (10) comprising a reel (22) mounted for movement relatively to a support (12), a base (14), with which said support can be brought in engagement, and a handle (16). Said support (12) and base (14) are associated with first and second latching members (28, 60). The latching members (28, 60) are capable of being brought into latching engagement with one another when said support (12) and said base (14) are moved relatively to one another to a latching position. The handle (16) is movable relatively to both the support (12) and the base (14) for facilitating disengagement of said support (12) from said base (14). Said support (12) and base (14) are associated with a first and a second series of electrical members (32, 68). The first and second series of electrical members (32, 68) are brought in electrical connection with one another when said support (12) and said base (14) are engaged with one another.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/34; H01R 13/627

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/34 (2006.01); H01R 13/506 (2006.01); H01R 13/627 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3213 (2013.01); H01R 13/506 (2013.01); H01R 13/6271 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948067A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9948067 A1 19990923; AU 2740599 A 19991011; DE 69920197 D1 20041021; DE 69920197 T2 20050922; DE 69920197 T8 20060223; EP 1070304 A1 20010124; EP 1070304 B1 20040915; ES 2228012 T3 20050401; GB 9805434 D0 19980506

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160312

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69920197

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131001

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110313

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120411

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-09 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120509

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110312

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100408

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100313

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061130

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-05-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2228012

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-03-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050308

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69920197

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-06-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STARPOINT ELECTRICS LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020315

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000912

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL