Global Patent Index - EP 1070325 A1

EP 1070325 A1 2001-01-24 - DEVICE FOR ACTIVATING CONDUCTIVITY IN POROUS STRUCTURES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ACTIVATING CONDUCTIVITY IN POROUS STRUCTURES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PÖROSEN LEITENDEN STRUKTUREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ACTIVATION CONDUCTRICE POUR STRUCTURES POREUSES

Publication

EP 1070325 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99910601 A

Priority

  • FR 9804547 A
  • IB 9900618 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2777210A1] The invention concerns the treatment of complex porous structures such as cross-linked foams, woven or nonwoven, to make them electrically conductive by depositing conductive polymers. The device enables, in a chemical reactor, to perform the activating treatment directly through non-reeled off blocks or rolls of porous structures, the treating fluids of the successive steps being made to circulate inside said blocks or rolls, via a perforated rotary mandrel whereon they are pressed. Said device enables to activate efficiently the structures, which may be metal-coated or not, and are particularly designed to be used as electrodes for liquid effluent electrolysis, of detectors and traps of organic or biological molecules, electrode supports for electrochemical generators, catalyst supports, filtering media, acoustic insulants, electromagnetic, nuclear and antistatic protection structures, heat exchangers and the like.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 1/12; C08J 9/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 5/08 (2006.01); D06M 15/61 (2006.01); H01B 1/12 (2006.01); H01B 13/00 (2006.01); C25D 5/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 1/12 (2013.01); C25D 5/56 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953503A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2777210 A1 19991015; DE 69918423 D1 20040805; DE 69918423 T2 20050714; EP 1070325 A1 20010124; EP 1070325 B1 20040630; ES 2223166 T3 20050216; HK 1034352 A1 20050225; JP 2002511635 A 20020416; JP 4393704 B2 20100106; US 6878355 B1 20050412; WO 9953503 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110409

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110409

2012-05-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120524

2012-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110408

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110408

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110408

2012-02-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111101

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110408

2011-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-11-09 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111101

2011-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOC. DE CONSEIL ET DE PROSPECTIVE SCIENTIFIQUE S.A

- Effective date: 20110430

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69918423

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100407

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100408

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100326

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100412

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100506

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20100428

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100329

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-02-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: LE BREVET A ETE REACTIVE SELON LA DEMANDE DE POURSUITE DE LA PROCEDURE DU 06.01.2006.

2006-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2005-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-02-25 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1034352

2005-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2223166 T3

2004-11-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-10-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69918423 P 20040805

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

2004-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-06-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030221

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001002

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE