Global Patent Index - EP 1070331 A1

EP 1070331 A1 2001-01-24 - ELECTRIC SWITCH

Title (en)

ELECTRIC SWITCH

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER SCHALTER

Title (fr)

INTERRUPTEUR ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1070331 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99944139 A

Priority

  • DE 9900978 W
  • DE 19815176 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19913712A1] The electric switch has a switch operating element (3), displaced from a rest position into 2 successive operating positions, for respective switch functions, with the movement of the switch operating element from the rest position blocked by a first locking device (5) and its movement from the first switch position blocked by a second locking device (6), both locking devices controlled by an operating element (7) with 3 switch positions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/20; H01H 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/20 (2006.01); H01H 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/20 (2013.01); H01H 9/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9952118A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19913712 A1 19991007; EP 1070331 A1 20010124; EP 1070331 B1 20020522; US 6555773 B1 20030429; WO 9952118 A1 19991014

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2003-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-09-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020822

2002-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901506 20020627

2002-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020522

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010917

2001-10-24 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000511

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000511;SI PAYMENT 20000511