Global Patent Index - EP 1070458 A2

EP 1070458 A2 2001-01-24 - Safety shoe

Title (en)

Safety shoe

Title (de)

Sicherheitsschuh

Title (fr)

Chaussure de securité

Publication

EP 1070458 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107812 A

Priority

DE 19928503 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19928503A1] The safety shoe has a domed protective cap (2) in the toe (1). A cushion component (9) is fitted at the back top edge of the cap and continues its curve.

Abstract (de)

Sicherheitsschuh, in dessen Schuhspitze (1) eine im wesentlichen kuppelförmige Schutzkappe (2) angeordnet ist, wobei die hintere Begrenzung (8) der Schutzkappe (2) auf der der Schuhspitze (1) abgewandten Seite ein Polsterteil (9) aufweist, das in einer im wesentlichen kongruent gestalteten Vorwölbung (10) der Schutzkappe (2) angeordnet ist, die sich von der Schuhsohle (4) weg nach oben erstreckt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 23/10; A43B 7/32; A43B 23/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/32 (2006.01); A43B 13/12 (2006.01); A43B 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/026 (2013.01); A43B 7/32 (2013.01); A43B 13/12 (2013.01); A43B 23/087 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19616027 A1 19971030 - ALSA GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19928503 A1 20001228; DE 19928503 B4 20040708; EP 1070458 A2 20010124; EP 1070458 A3 20011128; NO 20003194 A 20001227; NO 20003194 D0 20000620; NO 316674 B1 20040329

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020529

2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI