Global Patent Index - EP 1070463 A1

EP 1070463 A1 2001-01-24 - Applicator comprising twisted bristles

Title (en)

Applicator comprising twisted bristles

Title (de)

Auftragsvorrichtung mit schraubenförmigen Borsten

Title (fr)

Ensemble d'application comportant des fibres torsadées

Publication

EP 1070463 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401919 A

Priority

FR 9909528 A

Abstract (en)

The applicator consists of a reservoir (2) for the product and an applicator brush with a holder (3), a rod (5) and a bristle tip (4). The bristles (9) have a cross-section (S13) with one or more surface cavities and spiral twists. The bristles can be in one tuft aligned with the rod or a series of radial tufts held between twisted wires, depending on the product to be applied. They are between 2 and 25 mm long, having a cross-section fitting inside a circle of 0.06 and 0.30 mm diameter, and spiral grooves with a pitch of 2 - 9 mm. The cross-sectional shape of the bristles can be geometrical, e.g. in the form of a cross, star, crescent. hollow cylinder or polygon, or various letters of the alphabet.

Abstract (fr)

Applicateur (6) pour l'application d'un produit (M), notamment cosmétique, comportant: un élément de préhension (3) et un organe d'application (4), solidaire dudit élément de préhension, ledit organe d'application comprenant un arrangement de poils (9), caractérisé en ce qu'au moins une partie desdits poils présentent une section transversale (S4-S20) pourvue d'au moins une portion en creux (E), la surface desdits poils, présentant au moins une gorge hélicoïdale (G). L'invention concerne également un ensemble d'application équipé d'un tel applicateur (6), et l'utilisation de cet applicateur, notamment pour le maquillage des cils ou des ongles. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 34/04; A46D 1/00; D01D 5/253

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 29/00 (2006.01); A45D 34/04 (2006.01); A46B 3/18 (2006.01); A46B 9/02 (2006.01); A46D 1/00 (2006.01); B05C 17/00 (2006.01); B65D 83/00 (2006.01); D01D 5/253 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46D 1/0238 (2013.01); A45D 34/045 (2013.01); A46B 3/18 (2013.01); A46B 9/021 (2013.01); A46D 1/00 (2013.01); A46D 1/0246 (2013.01); D01D 5/253 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070463 A1 20010124; EP 1070463 B1 20040804; AR 024896 A1 20021030; AT 272336 T 20040815; BR 0003442 A 20010313; CA 2314828 A1 20010122; CA 2314828 C 20050111; CN 1282557 A 20010207; DE 60012637 D1 20040909; DE 60012637 T2 20050804; ES 2230039 T3 20050501; FR 2796532 A1 20010126; FR 2796532 B1 20020201; JP 2001061546 A 20010313; JP 2004249129 A 20040909; JP 3749427 B2 20060301; MX PA00007070 A 20020424; US 6390708 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050104

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: L'*OREAL

- Effective date: 20050731

2006-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-07-04 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050704

2005-07-04 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050704

2005-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2230039 T3

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-01-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-11-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041104

2004-11-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041104

2004-11-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041104

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60012637 P 20040909

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-04-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPLICATOR COMPRISING TWISTED BRISTLES

2004-03-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPLICATOR COMPRISING TWISTED BRISTLES

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030617

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI