Global patent index - EP 1070472 A1

EP 1070472 A1 2001-01-24 - Display system for advertising products and plate used therein

Title (en)

Display system for advertising products and plate used therein

Title (de)

System zur Präsentation von Werbematerialien und darin verwendbare Deckplatte

Title (fr)

Système de présentation de produits publicitaires et plaque utilisée dans un tel système

Publication

EP 1070472 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810656 A

Priority

EP 99810656 A

Abstract (en)

The system for displaying advertising material in a fixed order comprises a base panel (12) with a series of recesses (13, 14). A cover plate (21) which has a series of openings is fitted over this. The bases (54, 57, 58) of items of advertising material (44, 47, 48) are inserted through the openings in the cover plate into the recesses in the base plate. An Independent claim is included for a cover plate for the above system.

Abstract (de)

System zur Präsentation von Werbematerialien in einer bestimmten Anordnung. Zur Sicherstellung eines gleichen Erscheinungsbildes überall, wo eine Ausstellung der Werbematerialien eingerichtet wird, ist das System dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass es folgende Komponenten enthält: eine Basisplatte (12), welche eine systematische Anordnung von Aussparungen (13, 14) aufweist, eine Deckplatte (21), welche eine ausstellungsspezifische Anordnung von Öffnungen (22-26; 31-35) aufweist und auf der Basisplatte (12) in einer bestimmten Position positionierbar ist, und eine Vielzahl von Werbematerialeinheiten (42-48), deren Stützen (52-58) durch Öffnungen (22-26; 31-35) der Deckplatte (21) in Aussparungen (13, 14) der Basisplatte (12) einsteckbar sind, wobei je ein Endteil der Stütze (52-58) jeder Werbematerialeinheit (42-48) durch eine der Öffnungen (22-26; 31-35) der Deckplatte (21) in einer Aussparung (13, 14) der Basisplatte (12) einsteckbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/00 (2006.01); G09F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/00 (2013.01); A47F 7/0028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070472 A1 20010124

INPADOC legal status

2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030407

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010522

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI