Global Patent Index - EP 1070474 A1

EP 1070474 A1 2001-01-24 - Method for manufacturing a support for displaying documents and display support for such documents

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing a support for displaying documents and display support for such documents

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von einem Träger zur Präsentation von Dokumenten und Träger für solche Dokumente

Title (fr)

Procédé pour réaliser un support de présentation de documents et support de présentation pour de tels documents

Publication

EP 1070474 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420156 A

Priority

FR 9909627 A

Abstract (en)

The assembly method for a document display support has left (3) and right (4) side plates with connectors. A base has a lower section (6) facing (7) and back (8) walls and has connectors (12) complementary to those on the side plates to allow their attachment to the base.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un support de présentation pour documents ou analogues constitué à partir d'au moins trois pièces assemblées entre elles et formant respectivement : en tant que côté gauche et côté droit, une plaque latérale gauche (3) et une plaque latérale droite (4), équipées chacune de moyens d'assemblage placés de manière symétrique d'une plaque à l'autre, et un corps (5) délimitant un fond (6), une façade (7) et un dos (8), et étant équipé de moyens d'assemblage (12) complémentaires aux moyens d'assemblage des plaques, de manière à permettre par leur coopération, le montage des plaques sur le corps. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/14 (2006.01); B65D 6/18 (2006.01); B65D 6/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/147 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070474 A1 20010124; EP 1070474 B1 20051019; DE 60023221 D1 20051124; DE 60023221 T2 20060727; FR 2796539 A1 20010126; FR 2796539 B1 20011012

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110707

2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60023221

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110707

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100907

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100906

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060720

2006-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060130

2006-01-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-11-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60023221 P 20051124

2005-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2005-10-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-10-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030221

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010322

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI