Global Patent Index - EP 1070475 A2

EP 1070475 A2 2001-01-24 - Hard foam support for the installation of a bathtub or a shower tray on a substantially flat under surface

Title (en)

Hard foam support for the installation of a bathtub or a shower tray on a substantially flat under surface

Title (de)

Wannenträger aus Hartschaumstoff zum Aufstellen einer Bade- oder Duschwanne auf einen im wesentlichen ebenen Untergrund

Title (fr)

Support en mousse rigide pour l'installation d'une baignoire ou d'un bac de douche sur une surface essentiellement plane

Publication

EP 1070475 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108511 A

Priority

DE 19933120 A

Abstract (en)

The rigid foam mounting for a bath or shower panel comprises retaining components (12) and wall components (13, 14). These have longitudinal grooves (15, 16) pointing inwards and outwards which allow them to be bent into a curve.

Abstract (de)

Bei dieser Erfindung wird ein Wannenträger aus Hartschaumstoff zum Aufstellen einer Bade- oder Duschwanne auf einem im wesentlichen ebenen Untergrund vorgeschlagen, umfassend eine aus Wandelementen bestehende umlaufende Wannenschürze, wobei die Wandelemente eine dem Inneren des Wannenträgers zugewandte Innenseite und eine gegenüberliegend angeordnete Außenseite aufweisen. Zumindest ein Wandelement weist an seiner Innenseite und/oder seiner Außenseite eine Mehrzahl von in Montageposition vertikal verlaufender Längsnuten auf, die derart ausgebildet und angeordnet sind, daß das Wandelement um eine zu den Längsnuten parallele Vertikalachse biegbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/16 (2006.01); A47K 3/162 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/161 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070475 A2 20010124; EP 1070475 A3 20030702; CZ 20002643 A3 20010314; CZ 296002 B6 20051214; DE 19933120 C1 20010301; PL 341522 A1 20010129

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060725

2004-03-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI