Global Patent Index - EP 1070476 A2

EP 1070476 A2 2001-01-24 - Dispenser for care products

Title (en)

Dispenser for care products

Title (de)

Spender für Pflegemittel

Title (fr)

Distributeur de produits de soins

Publication

EP 1070476 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114910 A

Priority

DE 29912482 U

Abstract (en)

The dispenser comprises a container (6) having an opening via which it can be filled with the cleaning product i.e. soap. A dispensing unit is provided for dispensing a quantity of the soap from the container, and a holder (4) is provided which is inserted into the container at one side and is attached to e.g. a rod at the other side.

Abstract (de)

Ein Spender für Pflegemittel, insbesondere flüssige Seife, enthält eine Halterung sowie einen Behälter. Mit Hilfe der Halterung kann der Behälter, der die flüssige Seife aufnimmt, an einem Gegenstand angebracht werden. Der Behälter kann von der Halterung abgenommen werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 5/1202 (2013.01); A47K 2201/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29912482 U1 19990916; EP 1070476 A2 20010124; EP 1070476 A3 20011010

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060217

2004-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041028

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000717

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011201

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20000717

2001-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47K 5/12 A, 7A 47K 5/122 B, 7B 65D 23/00 B

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20000717