Global Patent Index - EP 1070497 A1

EP 1070497 A1 2001-01-24 - TABLET MANUFACTURING METHODS AND TABLET

Title (en)

TABLET MANUFACTURING METHODS AND TABLET

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON TABLETTEN SOWIE TABLETTE

Title (fr)

COMPRIME ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DE COMPRIME

Publication

EP 1070497 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99913634 A

Priority

  • JP 9901939 W
  • JP 9863598 A

Abstract (en)

A production method a tablet including at least active substance by means of a die and a pair of punches, comprising steps of; preparing molding material including active substance; housing said die and said pair of punches in a spraying chamber; generating pulsating vibration air and spraying lubricant mixed in air in said spraying chamber; applying lubricant on the surfaces of said die and said pair of punches housed in said spraying chamber while the lubricant sprayed in said spraying chamber is mixed with said pulsating vibration air; and tabletting said molding material by means of said die and said pair of punches on which surfaces said lubricant is applied. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 3/10 (2006.01); B30B 15/00 (2006.01); A61J 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/0011 (2013.01); A61J 3/10 (2013.01); A61J 3/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9952492 A1 19991021; AU 3169399 A 19991101; AU 764325 B2 20030814; CA 2328100 A1 19991021; CA 2328100 C 20110118; EP 1070497 A1 20010124; EP 1070497 A4 20090121; JP 4568427 B2 20101027

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20121101

2009-07-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-04-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KYOWA HAKKO KIRIN CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2009-01-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20081219

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001109

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE