Global patent index - EP 1070498 A2

EP 1070498 A2 2001-01-24 - An inertia driven device which returns in its original position so that a baby's pacifier stays upwards.

Title (en)

An inertia driven device which returns in its original position so that a baby's pacifier stays upwards.

Title (de)

Eine durch Trägheit betriebene Vorrichtung die in ihre ursprüngliche Position zurückkehrt, so dass ein Beruhigungsschnuller aufrecht stehenbleibt

Title (fr)

Dispositif entrainé par l'inertie qui retourne à sa position originale de sorte que la sucette reste dressée

Publication

EP 1070498 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830129 A

Priority

IT SA990007 A

Abstract (en)

This invention comes under the field of child-care articles made specially so that babies can place it in their mouths themselves. In particular, it is an extremely practical, simple device which, in any one of its various forms, if dropped, will automatically return to the position that guarantees the maximum hygiene without ever touching the ground in any way. An auto-stabilising baby's pacifier that is characterised by a flat base (2) that functions as a counter weight and is attached on its upper edge to a baby's pacifier teat (1) and which has a semicircular (4) rotating element connected to its upper lateral border, which in turn is connected to a string and a clip for attaching the pacifier to the baby's clothing. The aforesaid base (2) is, or contains, a counter weight, while on its upper border the pivot ends (3) of a rotating semicircular element (4). The rotating axis realised by the pivot of the ends (3) of the semicircular element (4) is situated above the total barycentre of the device + pacifier teat, so that any rotation that occurs around this axis tends to incline the pacifier teat into its original vertical position, that is, with the teat (1) facing upward, and also by the fact that the base with its counter weight (2) sets off a coupled reaction that returns the pacifier teat to its original position <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 17/008 (2015.05); A61J 7/0053 (2013.01); A61J 17/001 (2015.05); A61J 17/006 (2015.05)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070498 A2 20010124; EP 1070498 A3 20010509; IT SA990007 A1 19990524

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011110

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI