Global patent index - EP 1070530 A1

EP 1070530 A1 2001-01-24 - Oil filter cartridge

Title (en)

Oil filter cartridge

Title (de)

Filterpatrone für Kraftstoff

Title (fr)

Elément filtrant pour carburant

Publication

EP 1070530 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99309039 A

Priority

US 35657899 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel filter cartridge has a plurality of retention tabs (50) which radially integrally project along the roll seam structure (30) which joins a top section (24) of the housing to the cylindrical lower section (22). A base (14) has complementary slots (60) which allow for the cartridge to be axially inserted and rotated to secure the replaceable cartridge in position. Various numbers and configurations of the retention tabs may be provided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 27/06; B01D 27/08; B01D 35/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 27/06 (2006.01); B01D 35/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 35/30 (2013.01); B01D 27/06 (2013.01); B01D 2201/4015 (2013.01); B01D 2201/4046 (2013.01); Y10S 210/17 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B01D 27/06 + B01D 27/08

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070530 A1 20010124; EP 1070530 B1 20040506; DE 69917016 D1 20040609; DE 69917016 T2 20050407; ES 2221319 T3 20041216; US 6187188 B1 20010213

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151117

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-03 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: CLARCOR ENGINE MOBILE SOLUTIONS, LLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20140929

2014-09-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: CLARCOR ENGINE MOBILE SOLUTIONS,LLC, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20140807

2014-08-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CLARCOR ENGINE MOBILE SOLUTIONS, LLC, N. D. GE, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69917016

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140714

2014-08-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CLARCOR ENGINE MOBILE SOLUTIONS, LLC (N. D. GE, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69917016

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140714

2014-08-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69917016

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KUDLEK & GRUNERT PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20140714

2014-08-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140724 AND 20140730

2014-07-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69917016

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KUDLEK & GRUNERT PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2010-02-05 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: D3

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090731

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050208

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2221319

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69917016

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STANADYNE CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020621

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010207

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI