Global Patent Index - EP 1070549 A2

EP 1070549 A2 2001-01-24 - Apparatus for holding a workpiece

Title (en)

Apparatus for holding a workpiece

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Halterung von Werkestücken

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'accrochage d'objets

Publication

EP 1070549 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114897 A

Priority

DE 19934604 A

Abstract (en)

Device for holding a workpiece comprises a wire (8) to be fed through the through-bore in the workpiece. The wire has a barb hook element (9) for gripping in the through-bore. Preferred Features: The wire can be bent to cross-tie the hook element from the hook element gripping in the through-bore.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Halterung von Werkstücken, mit einem durch eine Durchgangsbohrung im Werkstück zu führenden Haltedraht. Solche Halterungen werden z.B. beim Verzinken von Werkstücken eingesetzt. Erfindungsgemäß weist der Haltedraht ein von ihm abspreizbares Widerhakenelement zum Hintergreifen der Durchgangsbohrung auf. Durch eine solche Halterungsvorrichtung, bei der die Kontaktfläche zwischen Werkstück und Halterung minimiert ist, wird die Oberflächenqualität des verzinkten Werkstücks durch die Halterung nicht beeinträchtigt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 3/02; C25D 17/06; C23C 2/00; F16G 11/00; F16G 11/10; B66C 1/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 2/00 (2006.01); F16G 11/00 (2006.01); F16G 11/10 (2006.01); C25D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 2/003 (2013.01); F16G 11/00 (2013.01); C25D 17/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070549 A2 20010124; EP 1070549 A3 20041117; DE 19934604 A1 20010201

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090523

2008-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20071221

2005-08-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-07-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20050510

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 05C 3/02 A

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 25D 17/06 B

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 23C 2/00 B

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 16G 11/00 B

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 16G 11/10 B

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 66C 1/66 B

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI