Global Patent Index - EP 1070550 A2

EP 1070550 A2 2001-01-24 - Apparatus for applying directly or indirectly a liquid or a pasty coating material on a moving web, in particular paper or cardboard web

Title (en)

Apparatus for applying directly or indirectly a liquid or a pasty coating material on a moving web, in particular paper or cardboard web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum direkten oder indirekten Auftragen eines flüssigen oder pastösen Auftragsmediums auf eine laufende Materialbahn, insbesondere aus Papier oder Karton

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour appliquer directement ou indirectement un produit de revêtement liquide ou pateux sur une bande en mouvement, notamment une bande de papier ou de carton

Publication

EP 1070550 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110036 A

Priority

DE 19934441 A

Abstract (en)

The application device (10) has an application chamber (44) in which the liquid or paste (12) is applied. The chamber has a sealing doctor device (32) on one side and a dosing doctor device (34) on the other. Both doctors are fitted on a carrier beam (20) by means of a rigid support unit (26) mounted on the beam.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Vorrichtung (10) zum direkten oder indirekten Auftragen eines flüssigen oder pastösen Auftragsmediums (12) auf eine Materialbahn (16), insbesondere aus Papier oder Karton, wird das Auftragsmedium (12) in einer Auftragskammer (44) mit der Materialbahn (16) oder der Oberfläche einer Gegenwalze in Kontakt gebracht. Die Auftragskammer (44) ist bezogen auf die Laufrichtung (L) der Materialbahn (16) einlaufseitig von einer Dichtrakelvorrichtung (32) und auslaufseitig von einer Dosierrakelvorrichtung (34) begrenzt. Darüber hinaus sind die beiden Rakelvorrichtungen (32, 34) an einem Tragbalken (20) angeordnet. Erfindungsgemäß sind die beiden Rakelvorrichtungen (32, 34) an einer am Tragbalken (20) vorgesehenen, im wesentlichen starren Stützeinheit (26) befestigbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 5/02; B05C 3/18; B05C 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/18 (2006.01); B05C 3/12 (2006.01); B05C 3/18 (2006.01); B05C 11/04 (2006.01); B05C 11/10 (2006.01); B05D 3/00 (2006.01); B05D 7/00 (2006.01); D21H 23/52 (2006.01); B05C 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 3/18 (2013.01); B05C 11/025 (2013.01); B05C 11/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070550 A2 20010124; EP 1070550 A3 20040211; CA 2314340 A1 20010122; DE 19934441 A1 20010125; JP 2001038275 A 20010213; US 6579368 B1 20030617

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050628

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-11-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2004-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05C 5/02 A

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05C 3/18 B

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05C 11/02 B

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI