Global Patent Index - EP 1070553 A1

EP 1070553 A1 2001-01-24 - Process for coating hot-dip zinc galvanized iron or steel articles

Title (en)

Process for coating hot-dip zinc galvanized iron or steel articles

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Beschichten der Oberfläche von feuervzerinkten Werkstücken aus Eisen oder Stahl

Title (fr)

Procédé pour revêtir des pièces en acier ou en fer galvanisées à chaud

Publication

EP 1070553 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00115412 A

Priority

DE 19933697 A

Abstract (en)

After cleaning and surface treatment of the zinc plating a primer is applied to form a base for an outer protective layer. The powdered epoxy resin primer is heated to effect a cure after application.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Beschichten der Oberfläche von verzinkten Werkstücken aus Eisen oder Stahl, bei dem auf die entsprechend vorbehandelte Zinkoberfläche zur Erzeugung eines ausreichenden Haftgrundes für eine anschließende Pulverbeschichtung anstelle eines wasserverdünnbaren Primers ein pulverförmiger Primer auf der Basis von Epoxidharz elektrostatisch aufgetragen und thermisch fixiert wird. Hierdurch erhält man einen besseren Oberflächenausgleich, bessere Kantenabdeckung und verbessertes Ausgasungsverhalten bei Erhalt eines guten Haftgrundes für die Deckbeschichtung.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/14 (2006.01); B05D 1/06 (2006.01); B05D 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/14 (2013.01); B05D 1/06 (2013.01); B05D 7/546 (2013.01); B05D 2350/65 (2013.01); B05D 2401/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19933697 A1 20010118; EP 1070553 A1 20010124

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-29 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020604

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI