Global Patent Index - EP 1070554 A1

EP 1070554 A1 2001-01-24 - AUTOMATIC WASHING TUNNEL FOR CLEANING AND DISINFECTING EXTERNALLY AND INTERNALLY WASTE CONTAINERS

Title (en)

AUTOMATIC WASHING TUNNEL FOR CLEANING AND DISINFECTING EXTERNALLY AND INTERNALLY WASTE CONTAINERS

Title (de)

AUTOMATISCHER WASCHTUNNEL ZUM REINIGEN UND DESINFIZIEREN DER INNEN- UND AUSSENSEITE VON ABFALLBEHÄLTERN

Title (fr)

TUNNEL DE LAVAGE AUTOMATIQUE POUR LE NETTOYAGE ET LA DESINFECTION EXTERNE ET INTERNE DE RECIPIENTS CONTENANT DES RESIDUS

Publication

EP 1070554 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98942687 A

Priority

  • ES 9800246 W
  • ES 9800769 A

Abstract (en)

Automatic washing tunnel for the internal and external cleaning and disinfecting of residue containers, which consists in the incorporation of the containers (1) onto a ramp (3), covered externally by a protection (10), in which is incorporated a device for hooking and transporting (8) and (8'), presenting lather and pressurised water emission towers (4), permitting their turning and internal and external cleaning by rollers (5), (6), (5') and (6'). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 9/08; B08B 9/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/08 (2006.01); B08B 9/087 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/0826 (2013.01); B08B 9/0821 (2013.01); B08B 9/087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9952655A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070554 A1 20010124; EP 1070554 B1 20030709; AU 9072898 A 19991101; DE 69816343 D1 20030814; DE 69816343 T2 20040603; ES 2152806 A1 20010201; ES 2152806 B1 20010816; PT 1070554 E 20031128; WO 9952655 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080310

2008-03-24 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080310

2006-08-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060830

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050908

2004-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040930

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040915

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69816343

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT PT

2003-01-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OCANA PUEYO, PEDRO JOSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-01-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PLATERO ARLABAN, JUAN ANGEL

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: OCANA PUEYO, PEDRO JOSE

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PLATERO ARLABAN, JUAN ANGEL

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001026

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT PT