Global Patent Index - EP 1070560 A1

EP 1070560 A1 2001-01-24 - Process for regulating the cooling water flow rate through the broad side walls of a continuous casting mould

Title (en)

Process for regulating the cooling water flow rate through the broad side walls of a continuous casting mould

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Regeln der Kühlwasser-Durchflussgeschwindigkeit durch Kokillenbreitseiten

Title (fr)

Procédé pour réguler la vitesse de passage de l'eau de refroidissement à travers les parois larges de lingotières de coulée continue

Publication

EP 1070560 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00114719 A

Priority

  • DE 19933602 A
  • DE 19953504 A

Abstract (en)

Process for regulating the cooling water flow-through speed through the wide sides of a mold from the start of casting until the theoretical casting speed is reached comprises integratively adapting the flow-through speed from a starting prescribed speed to the change of the heat flux density and reducing when there is a rise in this density via the critical heat flux density until the density levels out as a consequence of the increase in cooling water flow-through speed at a required heat flux density. Preferred Process: The regulation of the water circulation is adjusted according the thickness of the copper plates.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Regeln der Kühlwasser-Durchflußgeschwindigkeit durch Kokillenbreitseiten vom Gießstart bis zum Erreichen einer Soll-Gießgeschwindigkeit. Hierzu wird die Durchflußgeschwindigkeit des Kühlwassers von einer anfangs vorgegebenen Geschwindigkeit nach Maßgabe einer vorzugsweise online-meßbaren Änderung der Wärmestromdichte dieser integrativ angepaßt und bei einem Anstieg der Wärmestromdichte über die <IMAGE>kritische Wärmestromdichte" (q krit) abgesenkt, bis sich die Wärmestromdichte infolge eines Wieder-Hochfahrens der Kühlwasserdurchflußgeschwindigkeit bei einer erwünschten Wärmestromdichte einpendelt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] EP 0881018 A2 19981202 - SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]
  • [A] EP 0101521 A1 19840229 - KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 519 (M - 895) 20 November 1989 (1989-11-20)
  • [Y] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199213, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M22, AN 1992-102281, XP002151601

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070560 A1 20010124; EP 1070560 B1 20041201; AT 283744 T 20041215

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110708

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110708

2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008806

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 283744 T

- Effective date: 20110708

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050312

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008806 P 20050105

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT NL

2004-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES IT NL

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000708

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT NL

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI