Global patent index - EP 1070566 A2

EP 1070566 A2 2001-01-24 - Tool for engraving, particularly on glass plates and the like

Title (en)

Tool for engraving, particularly on glass plates and the like

Title (de)

Werkzeug zum Gravieren, insbesondere von Glasplatten und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Outil pour graver, en particulier des plaques de verre et similaire

Publication

EP 1070566 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00113196 A

Priority

IT MI990470 U

Abstract (en)

A tool for engraving, particularly on glass plates and the like, comprising a shank (2) for insertion in a spindle (12) of a working head (3). The shank is connected to a kinematic chain (20,21,23,24,26,27) for transmitting motion to a grinding wheel (30) whose axis of rotation is substantially perpendicular to the axis of the spindle (12) and whose plane of arrangement comprises the axis of the spindle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 19/03; B24B 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 19/03 (2006.01); B24B 41/04 (2006.01); B24B 55/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 19/03 (2013.01); B24B 41/04 (2013.01); B24B 55/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070566 A2 20010124; EP 1070566 A3 20020206; IT 246868 Y1 20020410; IT MI990470 U1 20010122; IT MI990470 V0 19990721

INPADOC legal status

2008-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060801

2004-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: Z. BAVELLONI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KYRO ITALY S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020726

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI