Global Patent Index - EP 1070586 A2

EP 1070586 A2 2001-01-24 - An acoustic ink jet printhead design and method of operation utilizing ink cross-flow

Title (en)

An acoustic ink jet printhead design and method of operation utilizing ink cross-flow

Title (de)

Entwurf eines akustischen Tintenstrahldruckkopfes und Verfahren zum Betrieb mit Tintenfluss in Querrichtung

Title (fr)

Conception d'une tête d'impression à jet d'encre acoustique et procédé de fonctionnement utilisant le flux transversal d'encre

Publication

EP 1070586 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00115326 A

Priority

  • US 36103599 A
  • US 35952099 A

Abstract (en)

A droplet emitter with an array of droplet emitting devices constructed such that a flowing liquid used create the droplets can flow through the droplet emitter at higher flow rates. The higher flow rates prevent excess heat absorption during the droplet emission process and allow for excess heat generated by control electronics to be transferred to the flowing liquid after droplet emission but before it leaves the droplet emitter. This prevents excess heat build-up within the droplet emitter and allows for higher more accurate droplet emission. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 2/015 (2006.01); B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14008 (2013.01); B41J 2202/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070586 A2 20010124; EP 1070586 A3 20010314; EP 1070586 B1 20080924; BR 0003104 A 20010313; CA 2313710 A1 20010123; CA 2313710 C 20040217; DE 60040318 D1 20081106; JP 2001038901 A 20010213; JP 4467725 B2 20100526

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-09-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090625

2008-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60040318 P 20081106

2008-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050117

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-03-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050117

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI