Global Patent Index - EP 1070589 A2

EP 1070589 A2 2001-01-24 - Ink-jet recording head, method for fabricating same and method for ejecting ink droplets

Title (en)

Ink-jet recording head, method for fabricating same and method for ejecting ink droplets

Title (de)

Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungskopf, Verfahren zur Herstellung und Verfahren zum Ausstossen von Tintentröpfchen

Title (fr)

Tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre, procédé pour sa fabrication et procédé d'éjection de gouttelettes d'encre

Publication

EP 1070589 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00114942 A

Priority

  • JP 20521499 A
  • JP 26909499 A

Abstract (en)

An ink-jet recording head including a plurality of pressure chambers (12a, 12b, 12c) connected to one another, a plurality of first piezoelectric elements (18a, 18b, 18c) and a plurality of second piezoelectric elements (19a, 19b, 19c). Each pair of the first piezoelectric element and the second piezoelectric element is independent of the other pairs. Accordingly, since the transmission of the stress generated during the printing in the piezoelectric pair to the nearby pair is completely or almost completely prevented because the adjacent pairs are completely separated or connected with an elastic material absorbing the stress. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1623 (2013.01); B41J 2/04525 (2013.01); B41J 2/04541 (2013.01); B41J 2/04581 (2013.01); B41J 2/04588 (2013.01); B41J 2/14274 (2013.01); B41J 2/1612 (2013.01); B41J 2/1632 (2013.01); B41J 2/1643 (2013.01); B41J 2/1646 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070589 A2 20010124; EP 1070589 A3 20010718; CN 1280917 A 20010124

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020809

2002-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUJI XEROX CO., LTD.

2002-04-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41J 2/14 A, 7B 41J 2/16 B

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI