Global Patent Index - EP 1070646 A1

EP 1070646 A1 2001-01-24 - Automatic coupling for rail vehicles, especially traction coupling

Title (en)

Automatic coupling for rail vehicles, especially traction coupling

Title (de)

Automatische Kupplung für Schienenfahrzeuge, insbesondere automatische Zugkupplung

Title (fr)

Autocoupleur pour véhicules sur rails, notamment couplage de traction

Publication

EP 1070646 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00114198 A

Priority

  • DE 19933996 A
  • DE 19947829 A

Abstract (en)

The automatic coupling has al shock absorber is constructed as a telescopic unit. The coupling may have two shock absorber arrangements, each with a shock absorber unit, and configured symmetrically in relation to each other and in the installed position symmetrically to the coupling head with regard to the theoretic connecting axis between the rail vehicles to be coupled.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine automatische Kupplung für Schienenfahrzeuge, insbesondere eine automatische Zugkupplung mit einem, über einen Kupplungsarm an einer Zugfeder (9) an einem Schienenfahrzeug (3) angelenkten und gegenüber dem Kupplungsarm in Einbaulage in Richtung der theoretischen Verbindungsachse AVtheoretisch zwischen den miteinander zu kuppelnden Schienenfahrzeugen betrachtet verschiebbaren Kupplungskopf (4). Erfindungsgemäß ist dem Kupplungskopf (4) eine Stoßdämpferanordnung (2) in Form einer Flüssigkeitsdämpferanordnung, umfassend wenigstens einen Stoßdämpfer, zugeordnet. Jeder Stoßdämpfer (2.1,2.2) ist dabei mit dem Kupplungskopf (4) und wenigstens mittelbar mit dem, dem Kupplungskopf zugeordneten Schienenfahrzeug (3), insbesondere der Waggonbohle verbunden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61G 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61G 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61G 7/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070646 A1 20010124; EP 1070646 B1 20040218

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50005303

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2005-02-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-08-18 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-05-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040518

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005303 P 20040325

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020913

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB SE

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI