Global patent index - EP 1070648 A1

EP 1070648 A1 2001-01-24 - Method and apparatus for lubricating a Vignoles railway track

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for lubricating a Vignoles railway track

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Schmieren eines Eisenbahnvignolgeleises

Title (fr)

Méthode et procédé pour lubrifier une voie ferrée du type Vignoles

Publication

EP 1070648 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00890223 A

Priority

AT 126299 A

Abstract (en)

The procedure for lubricating a T-rail track entails applying lubricating medium onto the track by movement of the applicator along it. An Independent claim is included for a device for carrying out the lubricating procedure which has a nozzle head attached to a mounting and equipped with preferably two spaced apart nozzle carriers(1) and which is movable along the track by a stationary drive(3) mounted preferably on one rail(4) and in the form of a double acting piston and cylinder unit(5). The nozzle head mounting is a rod passing through the cylinder of the drive and connected to the piston.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Schmieren eines Eisenbahnvignolgleises, insbesondere vor einem Kurvenabschnitt, der durch Radflansche von Eisenbahnwagen einer Abnutzung unterliegt, durch Auftragen von Schmiermittel, im wesentlichen horizontal, gegen die Innenseite des Eisenbahnvignolgleises mittels einer mit Schmiermittel versorgten Auftragseinrichtung, wobei das Schmiermittel durch Bewegen der Auftragseinrichtung entlang des zu schmierenden Gleises auf dieses aufgebracht wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61K 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61K 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61K 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070648 A1 20010124; AT 409844 B 20021125; AT A126299 A 20020415; US 6631786 B1 20031014

INPADOC legal status

2008-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080401

2007-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070614

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20010724;LT PAYMENT 20010724;LV PAYMENT 20010724;MK PAYMENT 20010724;RO PAYMENT 20010724;SI PAYMENT 20010724

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI