Global Patent Index - EP 1070669 A1

EP 1070669 A1 2001-01-24 - Beverage can with a protective film and heat-sealing apparatus therefore

Title (en)

Beverage can with a protective film and heat-sealing apparatus therefore

Title (de)

Getränkedose mit einer Schutzfolie und Heisssiegelvorrichtung dafür

Title (fr)

Boîte à boisson avec un film de protection et appareil de thermoscellage

Publication

EP 1070669 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00830493 A

Priority

IT BO990404 A

Abstract (en)

The subject of the invention is a pull-off cover (8) for soft drink cans (2'), heat-sealed to the top of the can where the pull-ring (11) is fitted, made of "matched" material capable of transferring the heat required to melt the sealing lacquer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 17/34; B65B 7/28; B65D 51/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 7/28 (2006.01); B65D 17/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 17/165 (2013.01); B65B 7/2878 (2013.01); B65D 2517/0098 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070669 A1 20010124; IT 1310415 B1 20020213; IT BO990404 A1 20010119; IT BO990404 D0 19990719

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20020722

2003-06-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ECOCAP'S S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011123

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI