Global Patent Index - EP 1070671 A1

EP 1070671 A1 2001-01-24 - Beam structure for an article carrier

Title (en)

Beam structure for an article carrier

Title (de)

TRÄGERSTRUKTUR FÜR EINEN TRAGBEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE DE TIRANT POUR SUPPORT D'ARTICLES

Publication

EP 1070671 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00202471 A

Priority

GB 9916690 A

Abstract (en)

A carton and a blank of a carton for packaging one or more articles, incorporating a beam structure extending between opposed carton side walls enabling said structure to be interposed between portions of said one or more articles to support said article. The beam structure comprising a pair of support panels extending between said side walls and connected thereto, the support panels are hinged along their common edge to form a beam of a substantially inverted "V-shaped" cross-section. A tab connected to the beam structure projects upwardly towards an article to be engaged therewith, thereby to reduce the relative movement of the carton and articles. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/40; B65D 71/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/46 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070671 A1 20010124; GB 9916690 D0 19990915

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-05 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070820

2007-07-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-10-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI