Global Patent Index - EP 1070674 A2

EP 1070674 A2 2001-01-24 - Apparatus for separating and picking out thin board type objects

Title (en)

Apparatus for separating and picking out thin board type objects

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Trennen und Entnehmen von dünnen, plattenförmigen Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Appareil pour séparer et prendre des objets en forme de plaques minces

Publication

EP 1070674 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305898 A

Priority

JP 20342799 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus (100) is proposed for separating and picking out one of a plurality of piled up thin board type objects (20). This apparatus includes a projection (130) and a suction pad (134) both provided above the piled up objects. The projection is made in contact with the objects moved up from below to thereby push each of the objects in the horizontal direction. The suction pad sticks fast to the top of the objects moved by the projection, and picks it out. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/08; B65H 3/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 59/04 (2006.01); B65H 1/22 (2006.01); B65H 3/08 (2006.01); B65H 3/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/22 (2013.01); B65H 3/0816 (2013.01); B65H 3/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070674 A2 20010124; EP 1070674 A3 20020417; JP 2001026321 A 20010130

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030812

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 3/08 A, 7B 65H 3/48 B, 7B 65H 1/22 B

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000801

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI