Global patent index - EP 1070722 A9

EP 1070722 A9 2001-04-04 - Silica with polyazacycloalkane units containing more than six nitrogen atoms, process for their preparation and use

Title (en)

Silica with polyazacycloalkane units containing more than six nitrogen atoms, process for their preparation and use

Title (de)

Silica mit Polyazacycloalkaneinheiten die mehr als sechs Stickstoffatome enthalten, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und Verwendung

Title (fr)

Nouveau gel de silice incorporant des motifs polyazacylcloalcanes comportant plus de six atomes d'azote, procédé de préparation et utilisation

Publication

EP 1070722 A9 (FR)

Application

EP 00401789 A

Priority

FR 9909587 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1070722A1] A new poly-aza-cycloalkane compound incorporating groups with more than six nitrogen atoms is claimed. The new poly-aza-cycloalkane compound incorporating groups with more than six nitrogen atoms is of formula (I). W1, W2, W3 = divalent radical of formula -((CT5T6)a -(CT1T2)n -(N(R4))p -(CT3T4)m -(CT7T8)b)l- (A); p = 0 or 1; l = 1-10 (preferably 1-5); n and m = 1-3; a and b = 0-2; T1-T8 = H, 1-15C linear/branched alkyl or 7-12C ((hetero)aryl) alkyl, or CT1T2 and/or CT3T4 and/or CT5T6 and/or CT7T8 represent divalent group -(C=O)-; R4 = H, 1-15C linear/branched alkyl (substituted or not with one or more functional groups) or 7-12C ((hetero)aryl) alkyl, or formula R5-Si(X1)(X2)(X3) (B); X1, X2 and X3 = H, halogen or OR6; R6 = H or 1-4C alkyl; R5 = divalent radical derived from 1-10C aliphatic (un)saturated hydrocarbon chain optionally including one or more chain structures selected from arylene or -O-, -S-, -O-C(=O)-, -N(R7)- or -C(=O)- groups; R7 = H, 1-6C aliphatic hydrocarbon, benzyl or phenetyl; R1-R3 = identical or different (independently from each other and R4) H, 1-15C linear/branched alkyl (substituted or not with one or more functional groups) or 7-12C ((hetero)aryl) alkyl, or formula (B). Full definitions given in DEFINITIONS. Independent claims are also included for: (1) the preparation of compound (I) by: (a) reacting compound of formula Z-R5'-Si (X1) (X2) (X3) (C) with a compound of formula (I') at least one of cyclic N atoms is non-substituted, to form (I) as defined before; and (b) functionalizing all or part of non-substituted cyclic N of compound (I) as defined before, to form the compound of formula (Id), which corresponds to (I) having at least one of R1-R4 representing radical -(CH2)w-C(=O)-V (with w and V as defined before); (2) polysiloxane gel (III) incorporating polyaza-macrocycles and metallic complexes of their N-ligands, and obtained by hydrolysis of compound (I) as claimed, leading to formation of polysiloxane gel incorporating non-metallic polyaza-macrocycles (III'), followed by its treatment of (III') with metallic salt, where the metal element is cobalt or copper; (3) polysiloxane gel (IV) incorporating polyaza-macrocycles and metal complexes of their N-ligands, obtained by treating compound (I) as claimed with metallic salt (preferably of copper or cobalt) to form organometallic complex of (I), followed by hydrolysis of obtained organometallic complex; (4) the preparation of gel (III) and (IV); (5) the use of hybrid metallized gels as claimed in process of separation of gases from their mixtures, under conditions permitting absorption of gas to be separated in gel, followed by desorption and recuperation of desorbed gas (especially in process of separation of oxygen from air, aimed at production of pure oxygen, or at elimination of oxygen from air); (6) non-metallic gel (III') as defined before; (7) the use of gel (III') in purification of liquids and especially hydrogen peroxide; and (8) use of gel (III') in purification of gases by adsorption of undesired impurities. X1, X2 and X3 = H, halogen or OR6; R6 = H or 1-4C alkyl; R5 = divalent radical derived from 1-10C aliphatic (un)saturated hydrocarbon chain optionally including one or more chain structures selected from arylene or -O-, -S-, -O-C(=O)-, -N(R7)- or -C(=O)- groups; R7 = H, 1-6C aliphatic hydrocarbon radical, or benzyl or phenetyl radical; Z = functional group able to react with secondary amine group =N-H, and form covalent N-C liaison; W1', W2', W3' = divalent group of formula -((CT5T6)a -(CT1T2)n -(N(R4'))p -(CT3T4)m -(CT7T8)b)l- (A'); a, b, p, l, m, n, T1-T8 = same as in (A) of (I); R4' = H, 1-15C linear/branched alkyl radical (substituted or not with one or more functional groups) or 7-12C ((hetero)aryl) alkyl radical; R1'-R3' = identical or different (independently from each other and R4') H, 1-15C linear/branched alkyl (substituted or not with one or more functional groups) or 7-12C ((hetero)aryl) alkyl.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07F 7/18; B01D 53/00; B01J 45/00; C08G 77/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01B 13/02 (2006.01); B01J 20/22 (2006.01); C01B 15/013 (2006.01); C01B 21/04 (2006.01); C07F 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07F 7/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070722 A1 20010124; EP 1070722 A9 20010404; EP 1070722 B1 20040811; AT 273309 T 20040815; CA 2314315 A1 20010123; CA 2314315 C 20110705; DE 60012832 D1 20040916; DE 60012832 T2 20050818; DK 1070722 T3 20041213; ES 2226741 T3 20050401; FR 2796645 A1 20010126; FR 2796645 B1 20010914; JP 2001097980 A 20010410; JP 4800466 B2 20111026; PT 1070722 E 20050131; US 6534649 B1 20030318

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-05-17 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20120504

2012-04-18 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20120413

2012-04-18 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: TD

- Effective date: 20120413

2012-02-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: CNRS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20120124

2012-02-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60012832

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-01-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE3 RUE

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20120118

2012-01-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20120118

2012-01-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A.

2012-01-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2008-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050622

2006-05-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-03-22 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060322

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-22 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050622

2005-06-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050622

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2226741

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2005-03-16 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040811

2005-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Effective date: 20041109

2004-12-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-12-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SUSI PRYDE-HAENI BSC

2004-11-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60012832

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020604

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI