Global Patent Index - EP 1070756 A1

EP 1070756 A1 2001-01-24 - Sulfur containing lubricant

Title (en)

Sulfur containing lubricant

Title (de)

Schwefelhaltige Schmierstoffe

Title (fr)

Lubrifiant comprenant du soufre

Publication

EP 1070756 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00114894 A

Priority

DE 19934182 A

Abstract (en)

The lubricant contains nano-particulate sulfur having an average partial diameter in the region of 10-1500 nm. Preferred Features: The average partial diameter is in the region of 25-800 nm. The lubricant contains 0.02-50, preferably 0.1-5 wt.% nano-particulate sulfur. The sulfur contained in the lubricant is obtained by freeze drying an aqueous sulfur dispersion.

Abstract (de)

Schmierstoffe mit einem Gehalt an nanopartikulärem Schwefel dessen mittlerer Teilchendurchmesser im Bereich von 10 bis 1500nm liegt. Die Schwefelpartikel können mit einem oder mehreren Oberflächenmodifikationsmitteln ummantelt sein und im Schmierstoff in einer Konzentration von 0,02 bis 50Gew.-% enthalten sein. Der nanopartikuläre Schwefel zeichnet sich durch gute Schmierwirkung sowie gute Dispergiergarkeit in Schmierstoff-Formulierungen aus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 173/00; C10M 125/06; C10M 173/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 125/06 (2006.01); C10M 173/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 173/00 (2013.01); C10M 125/06 (2013.01); C10M 2201/02 (2013.01); C10M 2201/043 (2013.01); C10N 2240/401 (2013.01); C10N 2250/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 173/00 + C10M 125/06

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070756 A1 20010124; DE 19934182 A1 20010125

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020409

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2001-08-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI