Global Patent Index - EP 1070779 A1

EP 1070779 A1 2001-01-24 - Spider for high speed washing machine baskets, a washing machine basket provided with this spider and a method for making the basket

Title (en)

Spider for high speed washing machine baskets, a washing machine basket provided with this spider and a method for making the basket

Title (de)

Haltekranz für eine Hochgeschwindigkeitswaschmaschinentrommel, eine Waschmaschinetrommel mit einem solcher Stern und ein Verfahren zur Herstellung der Trommel

Title (fr)

Couronne avec supports en étoile pour tambours de machine à laver tournants à grande vitesse, tambour de machine à laver équipée d'une telle couronne et procédé pour fabriquer le tambour

Publication

EP 1070779 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00112732 A

Priority

IT MI991611 A

Abstract (en)

A spider for high speed washing machine baskets comprises a ring element (6) with a plurality of spokes (8) coupling the ring element to a central hub (7). The ring element (6) is provided with projections (10) engaging in slots of the basket bottom. The coupling of the basket to the spider is performed by clamping. With respect to prior washing machine baskets, the inventive basket has the advantage that it can resist against mechanical stresses generated at high centrifugation speeds, while having a very simple construction, owing to the absence of coupling rivets and the like. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 37/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070779 A1 20010124; IT 1313196 B1 20020617; IT MI991611 A1 20010122; IT MI991611 D0 19990721

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030818

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030207

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010322

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI