Global Patent Index - EP 1070787 A1

EP 1070787 A1 2001-01-24 - Tamping machine for tamping ballast under the sleepers of a railway track

Title (en)

Tamping machine for tamping ballast under the sleepers of a railway track

Title (de)

Stopfaggregat zum Unterstopfen von Schwellen eines Gleises

Title (fr)

Machine de bourrage pour bourrage du ballast sous les traverses d'une voie ferrée

Publication

EP 1070787 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00890191 A

Priority

AT 128299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2314207A1] A tamping unit (1) for tamping sleepers (2) of a track (3) is equipped wi th tamping tines (17, 18) tiltable about horizontal pivot axes (16) and arrange d in pairs in the transverse direction of the track. These tamping tines are mounted on tw o tamping tool carriers (8, 10), arranged successively with respect to a longitudinal direction extending perpendicularly to the pivot axes (16) and vertically adjustable independently of one another by means of drives (12), and are respectively connected via squeeze drives (14) to vibration drives (13). Mounted on each tamping to ol carrier (8, 10) is an end pair of tamping tines (17), with respect to the longitudinal direction, for immersion in an end sleeper crib (20) and also two pairs of twin tamping tines (18) provided for immersion in a sleeper crib (21) adjacent to the end sleeper crib (20) and for tamping two adjacent sleepers (2). Arranged between the tw o tamping tool carriers (8, 10) is a further, central tamping tool carrier (9) , vertically adjustable independently of them by means of its own drive (12), on which ar e positioned two pairs of twin tamping tines (19) provided for immersion in a central sleeper crib (22), with respect to the longitudinal direction, and squeezabl e apart for tamping two adjacent sleepers (2) simultaneously.

Abstract (de)

Ein Stopfaggregat (1) zum Unterstopfen von Schwellen (2) eines Gleises (3) ist mit um horizontale Schwenkachsen (16) verschwenkbaren und in Gleisquerrichtung paarweise angeordneten Stopfpickeln (17,18) ausgestattet. Diese sind auf zwei bezüglich einer normal zu den Schwenkachsen (16) verlaufenden Längsrichtung hintereinander angeordneten und durch Antriebe (12) unabhängig voneinander höhenverstellbaren Stopfwerkzeugträgern (8,10) gelagert und jeweils über Beistellantriebe (14) mit Vibrationsantrieben (13) verbunden. Auf jedem Stopfwerkzeugträger (8,10) sind dabei ein bezüglich der Längsrichtung endseitiges Paar von Stopfpickeln (17) zum Eintauchen in ein endseitiges Schwellenfach (20) sowie zwei zum Eintauchen in ein dem endseitigen Schwellenfach (20) benachbartes Schwellenfach (21) und zum Unterstopfen zweier benachbarter Schwellen (2) vorgesehene Paare von Zwillingsstopfpickeln (18) gelagert. Zwischen den beiden Stopfwerkzeugträgern (8,10) ist ein weiterer, durch einen eigenen Antrieb (12) unabhängig von diesen höhenverstellbarer, mittiger Stopfwerkzeugträger (9) angeordnet, auf dem zwei zum Eintauchen in ein bezüglich der Längsrichtung mittiges Schwellenfach (22) vorgesehene und zum gleichzeitigen Unterstopfen zweier benachbarter Schwellen (2) voneinander beistellbare Paare von Zwillingsstopfpickeln (19) positioniert sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 27/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070787 A1 20010124; EP 1070787 B1 20040908; AU 4878200 A 20010125; AU 770543 B2 20040226; CA 2314207 A1 20010123; CA 2314207 C 20051206; CN 1215225 C 20050817; CN 1281921 A 20010131; CZ 20002628 A3 20010314; CZ 292121 B6 20030813; DE 50007665 D1 20041014; DK 1070787 T3 20041213; ES 2226768 T3 20050401; JP 2001059203 A 20010306; JP 4485662 B2 20100623; NO 20003754 A 20010124; NO 20003754 D0 20000721; NO 317008 B1 20040719; PL 199306 B1 20080930; PL 341468 A1 20010129; RU 22787 U1 20020427; UA 66374 C2 20010215; US 6389979 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170821

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170701

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170508

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170508

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170510

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170510

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170510

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170510

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170510

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170510

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-04 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PLASSER & THEURER, EXPORT VON BAHNBAUMASCHINEN, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FRANZ PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCHINEN-INDUSTRIEGESELLSCHAFT M.B.H., WIEN, AT

- Document: DE 50007665

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-11-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50007665

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50007665

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050208

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-07-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-14 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050614

2005-06-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050614

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226768 T3

2004-12-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-12-08 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007665 P 20041014

2004-10-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI