Global Patent Index - EP 1070791 A2

EP 1070791 A2 2001-01-24 - Track cleaner

Title (en)

Track cleaner

Title (de)

Fahrbahnräumer

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'enlèvement pour voie ferrée

Publication

EP 1070791 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114797 A

Priority

DE 19933914 A

Abstract (en)

The path clearing device has a clearance plate formed in one or more parts and mountings for securing the clearance plate (7) to the chassis (1) of the locomotive, allowing deformation for absorbing shock loads acting on the clearance plate. The mountings are provided by a torsion-resistant support structure, e.g. a hollow cylinder, with a circular plate (9) at its top end secured to a cross member of the chassis at its centre and a circular plate (11) at its bottom end supporting the clearance plate.

Abstract (de)

Ein Fahrbahnräumer für ein Schienenfahrzeug besteht aus einem oder mehreren Räumschildern, die mit einer Halterung am Tragrahmen des Schienenfahrzeugs befestigt sind. Bei der Befestigung des sich über die gesamte Breite des Schienenfahrzeugs erstreckenden Fahrbahnräumers besteht das Problem, daß weit auseinanderliegende Befestigungsstellen vorzusehen sind, die eine hohe Fertigungsgenauigkeit und einen hohen Aufwand beim Einbau erfordern. Um einen einfach herzustellenden und zu montierenden Fahrbahnräumer zu schaffen, wird für den Fahrbahnräumer eine Halterung vorgeschlagen, die aus einer torsionsfesten Tragstruktur besteht, die mit ihrem oberen Ende mittig am Kopfträger befestigt ist und an deren unterem Ende der Räumschild befestigt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01H 8/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01H 8/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01H 8/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070791 A2 20010124; EP 1070791 A3 20020612; EP 1070791 B1 20051012; AT 306586 T 20051015; DE 19933914 A1 20010125; DE 50011315 D1 20051117

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161012

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-09-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060713

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2005-11-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011315 P 20051117

2005-10-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AG

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHNEIDER, SIEGHARD, DIPL.-ING.

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI