Global patent index - EP 1070792 A2

EP 1070792 A2 2001-01-24 - Track cleaner

Title (en)

Track cleaner

Title (de)

Fahrbahnräumer

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'enlèvement pour voie ferrée

Publication

EP 1070792 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114798 A

Priority

DE 19933915 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement consists of a clearing shield and fixtures, with which the shield is fastened to a carrying frame (1) of the rail vehicle, and which deform at an impact load on the shield, which oversteps a predetermined limit. The fixtures (9, 22, 26, 30) are designed in such way, that the track clearing arrangement (8) is held parallel to the plane of the carrying frame at a deformation of the fixtures through the impact load. A dissipation of the energy of the impact load results through one or several energy dissipation elements (17, 18, 26, 33) arranged at the fixtures.

Abstract (de)

Ein Fahrbahnräumer 8 für ein Schienenfahrzeug besteht aus einem oder mehreren Räumschilden, die mit einer Halterung 9 am Tragrahmen 1 des Schienenfahrzeugs befestigt sind. Um die Gefahr zu mindern, daß der Fahrbahnräumer 8 bei einer Kollision mit einem Hindernis nach unten wegknickt und das Schienenfahrzeug zum Entgleisen bringt und um zu vermeiden, daß sich bei einer Verformung der Halterung 9 des Fahrbahnräumers 8 der Tragrahmen 1 mitverformt, wird vorgeschlagen, die Halterung 9 so auszugestalten, daß der Fahrbahnräumer 8 bei einer Kollision mit einem Hindernis unter Energieaufnahme durch in der Halterung 9 angeordnete Energieverzehrelemente 17, 18 im wesentlichen parallel zur Ebene des Tragrahmens 1 gehalten bleibt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01H 8/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01H 5/06 (2006.01); E01H 8/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01H 8/04 (2013.01); E01H 5/063 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070792 A2 20010124; EP 1070792 A3 20020612; EP 1070792 B1 20051221; AT 313664 T 20060115; DE 19933915 A1 20010125

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151002

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150604

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150715

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-11-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060922

2006-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50011890

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-01-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-12-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-12-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2005-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040514

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHNEIDER, SIEGHARD, DIPL.-ING.

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI