Global Patent Index - EP 1070799 A2

EP 1070799 A2 2001-01-24 - Modular panel for building prefab room structures like cabins, hotel rooms or the like, and manufacture process thereof

Title (en)

Modular panel for building prefab room structures like cabins, hotel rooms or the like, and manufacture process thereof

Title (de)

Modulares Paneel für die Vorfertigung von Raumstrukturen wie Kabinen, Hotelzimmer oder ähnliches und Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Panneau modulaire pour la construction préfabriquée d'unités d'habitation telles que cabines, chambres d'hôtel ou similaire et méthode de fabrication

Publication

EP 1070799 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830496 A

Priority

IT UD990136 A

Abstract (en)

An improved modular panel, suitable for the construction of prefab rooms, comprises a plurality of layers of various materials associated thereamong, having: at least one inner layer (11) of light-weight hydrate of calcium silicate, with a specific weight of about 250 kg/m<3>; a first outer layer (15) in plastics or metal laminate; a second layer (17) made of a containment and stiffening lathing opposed with respect to said first outer layer (15), said inner layer (11) having a thickness equal to at least the 50% of the overall thickness of the panel (10) . <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 2/04; E04B 2/72; E04C 2/26; E04H 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 11/00 (2006.01); B28B 11/04 (2006.01); E04B 1/348 (2006.01); E04C 2/296 (2006.01); E04B 1/61 (2006.01); E04B 2/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 11/003 (2013.01); B28B 11/04 (2013.01); E04B 1/34869 (2013.01); E04C 2/296 (2013.01); E04B 1/6145 (2013.01); E04B 1/6162 (2013.01); E04B 2002/725 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070799 A2 20010124; EP 1070799 A3 20030326; IT 1310881 B1 20020222; IT UD990136 A1 20010122; IT UD990136 D0 19990722

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04C 2/04 A, 7E 04C 2/26 B, 7E 04B 2/72 B, 7E 04H 1/12 B, 7E 04C 2/296 B, 7B 28B 11/00 B, 7B 28B 11/12 B, 7E 04B 1/348 B

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SOLDERA MATTEO

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI