Global Patent Index - EP 1070804 A1

EP 1070804 A1 2001-01-24 - Method for renovating a premise or room as well as a cabin unit with walls surrounding a flooring

Title (en)

Method for renovating a premise or room as well as a cabin unit with walls surrounding a flooring

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Renovieren eines Raumes oder Zimmers sowie kabinenartige Zelle mit eine Bodenfläche umgebenden Wänden

Title (fr)

Procédé pour rénover un local ou une pièce ainsi qu'un bloc cabine comportant des cloisons entourant une surface au sol

Publication

EP 1070804 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00115562 A

Priority

  • DE 19933074 A
  • DE 10002497 A

Abstract (en)

The inside walls of the bathroom (10) are measured after removing the installations which project away from the walls. A separate wet cell is prepared in a work shop which includes fitting new installations. The wet cell (20) is dismantled into transport units which are then installed in the bathroom with the wet cell fittings being connected to the existing house fittings in the bathroom. At least one wall of the cell is set spaced from the adjoining inside wall of the bathroom. A quick-setting plaster can be applied once the walls are in place. Independent claim describes cabin-like cell with demountable wall elements, floor and ceiling elements.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Renovieren eines vorhandenen Baderaumes oder Badezimmers (10) sind die folgenden Schritte vorgesehen: nach Vermessen der inneren Wandflächen des Badraumes und Entfernen der von den Wänden abragenden Installationen wird eine gesonderte Nasszelle (20) in einer Werkstatt hergestellt einschließlich des Anbringens neuer Installationen. Dann wird diese Nasszelle in Transporteinheiten zerlegt, zum Einbauort gebracht sowie dort in den Baderaum eingebaut, anschließend werden die Nasszellenanschlüsse mit den Hausanschlüssen des Baderaumes verbunden und ein schnellhärtender Estrich eingebracht. Die kabinenartige Nasszelle wird also aus mehreren demontierbaren, die Installationen enthaltenden Wandelementen maßgenau zusammengesetzt sowie durch Bodenelemente und Deckenelemente ergänzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/348 (2006.01); E04F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/34869 (2013.01); E04F 13/0803 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070804 A1 20010124

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050804

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040226

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI