Global Patent Index - EP 1070805 A2

EP 1070805 A2 2001-01-24 - Floor covering for modular rooms with foot and vehicle access

Title (en)

Floor covering for modular rooms with foot and vehicle access

Title (de)

Bodenbelag für begeh- und befahrbare Raumzellen

Title (fr)

Revêtement de sols pour espaces modulaires prévus pour l'accès aux piétons et véhicules

Publication

EP 1070805 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113656 A

Priority

DE 29912753 U

Abstract (en)

The covering consists of at least one steel plate section having a thickness (S) of between 0.7 and 2.5 mm. The plate has an upper structuring which consists of several bumps (1) which have flat and roughened top surfaces. The bumps are circular and comprises between two thirds and half of the total floor area. The bumps have a height of approximately half the thickness of the plate.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Bodenbelag, insbesondere für begeh- und befahrbare Kühl- und Frischhaltezellen, bestehend aus mindestens einem Edelstahlblechzuschnitt mit einer Stärke (S) in der Größenordnung von o,7 bis 2,5 mm, der mit einer Oberflächenstrukturierung versehen ist, wobei die Strukturierung aus zur Begeh- und Befahrseite (B) ausgeprägten Noppen (1) gebildet und die Noppen (1) ebenflächige, mit Aufrauhschliff versehen Oberflächen aufweisen. Nach der Erfindung ist die Kombination folgender, teilweise bekannter Merkmale vorgesehen: Die Noppen (1) sind kreisförmig ausgebildet; die die Noppen umgebende unverprägte Fläche (F) des Blechzuschnittes (2) hat in Bezug auf die Summe aller Noppenflächen (F') eine Größenordnung des 1,5 bis 2-Fachen und die Noppen (1) haben eine Ausprägungshöhe (H), die unabhängig von der Blechstärke mit nur o,2 bis o,5, vorzugsweise o,35 mm bemessen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29912753 U1 19991125; EP 1070805 A2 20010124; EP 1070805 A3 20010905

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-23 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20030103

2003-07-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011116

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04F 15/06 A, 7E 04C 2/32 B

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI