Global Patent Index - EP 1070809 A2

EP 1070809 A2 2001-01-24 - Variable sight-line grandstand seating arrangement

Title (en)

Variable sight-line grandstand seating arrangement

Title (de)

Tribünenbestuhlungssystem mit veränderbarer Sichtlinie

Title (fr)

Système de chaises pour tribune à ligne de vision variable

Publication

EP 1070809 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00306217 A

Priority

US 14535499 P

Abstract (en)

A grandstand seating arrangement (10) has a plurality of seating level members (22) each having first and second ends and arranged in sequentially elevated relation to one another by a predetermined height. A rigid frame (13) that is coupled to and arranged to support the plurality of seating level members has a lower frame portion (76) coupled to a plurality of lifting arrangements (15,16) for displacing same vertically and an upper frame portion (27) coupled rigidly to the lower frame portion. Additionally, there is included a plurality of stanchion supports (12) each associated with a respective one of the plurality of seating level members, and a lower stop (52) disposed on each stanchion support and arranged at a respective height that is responsive to the height of the associated seating level member. Seating level member supports (20) support a respectively plurality of seating level members, each of which is coupled to and displaceable along a respective stanchion support. The plurality of seating level member supports are arranged to be supported by the lower stops (52) when the lifting arrangements are in the lowermost position. When the lifting arrangements are operated to raise the rigid frame, the seating level member support and the seating level members thereon are sequentially raised from the respective associated lower stops. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 3/126 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070809 A2 20010124; EP 1070809 A3 20020410

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051018

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030314

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI