Global Patent Index - EP 1070810 A1

EP 1070810 A1 2001-01-24 - Vehicle door handle

Title (en)

Vehicle door handle

Title (de)

Türgriff für eine Fahrzeugtür

Title (fr)

Poignée de porte pour véhicule

Publication

EP 1070810 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00401954 A

Priority

DE 19933646 A

Abstract (en)

The door handle has a base part (3) with a pivotable grip part (4) and a lock cylinder (5) rotatable from a secured to a non-secured position and into an emergency-on position. The grip part is connected to a pivoting lever (8) within the door with a cam (9) that actuates an electrical switch (10) for activating a door lock. The door handle contains a pivotable actuating lever (12) connected to the door lock via a mechanical connection and, in the emergency-on position, via a drive element (14) on the pivoting lever to the grip part so that the actuating lever can be pivoted.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Türgriff für eine Fahrzeugtür mit einem Griffteil (4), einem von einer gesicherten in eine ungesicherte sowie in eine "Not-Auf"-Position drehbaren Schließzylinder (5;5') und einem Betätigungshebel (12;12'), der einerseits über eine mechanische Verbindung (13) mit einem Türschloß (11) und andererseits in der "Not-Auf"-Position des Schließzylinders (5;5') über einen Mitnehmer (14;14') und einem Schwenkhebel (8) mit dem Griffteil (4) in Wirkverbindung steht, wobei der Mitnehmer (14;14') über eine an dem Schließzylinder (5;5') angeordnete Schaltwalze (18; 18') ansteuerbar ist. Um zu vermeiden, daß der Betätigungshebel (12;12') in der gesicherten Stellung des Schließzylinders (5;5') bei Betätigung des Griffteiles (4) verschwenkt werden kann, schlägt die Erfindung vor, daß an dem Betätigungshebel (12;12') ein Stützarm (21;21') und an der Schaltwalze (18;18') eine Sperrippe (22;22') angeordnet sind, derart, daß in der gesicherten Position des Schließzylinders (5;5') der Stützarm (21;21') an der Sperrippe (22;22') anliegt und dadurch ein Verschwenken des Betätigungshebels (12;12') verhindert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 5/00; E05B 17/20; E05B 47/00; E05B 65/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/44 (2014.01); E05B 85/18 (2014.01); E05B 17/20 (2006.01); E05B 81/76 (2014.01); E05B 81/90 (2014.01); E05B 83/16 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/18 (2013.01); E05B 77/44 (2013.01); E05B 81/76 (2013.01); E05B 81/90 (2013.01); E05B 83/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070810 A1 20010124; DE 19933646 A1 20010125; DE 19933646 C2 20030528

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040427

2004-03-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SICHERHEITSSYSTEME GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI