Global Patent Index - EP 1070811 A1

EP 1070811 A1 2001-01-24 - A housing for a closure member retaining assembly and a method of attachment thereof

Title (en)

A housing for a closure member retaining assembly and a method of attachment thereof

Title (de)

Schliessvorrichtungsgehäuse und Verfahren zu dessen Befestigung

Title (fr)

Boîtier pour dispositif de fermeture et procédé pour sa fixation

Publication

EP 1070811 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00115794 A

Priority

GB 9917166 A

Abstract (en)

A housing (10) for a closure member retaining assembly (11) such as a garage door lock assembly having a resiliently deformable attachment part (18) by which the housing (10) may be attached to the closure member (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/08 (2006.01); E05B 65/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/08 (2013.01); E05C 9/026 (2013.01); E05B 65/0021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070811 A1 20010124; GB 2352764 A 20010207; GB 9917166 D0 19990922

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020729

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI