Global Patent Index - EP 1070813 A1

EP 1070813 A1 2001-01-24 - Flat key

Title (en)

Flat key

Title (de)

Flachschlüssel

Title (fr)

Clé plate

Publication

EP 1070813 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00401953 A

Priority

DE 19933645 A

Abstract (en)

The flat key has a handle part (2) with a housing (5) and a key bit (3) that can pivot between folded in and out positions. The key bit pivotable about an axis transverse to its length towards the broad side of the housing into a recess in the housing, in which it can be fixed by a locking device (14). The bit is pivoted to its deployed position by a coil spring (11) after being released from the locking device

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Flachschlüssel mit einem Griffteil (2) und einem Schlüsselbart (3), wobei das Griffteil (2) ein Gehäuse (5) umfaßt und der Schlüsselbart (3) von einer eingeklappten in eine ausgeklappte Stellung verschwenkbar an dem Griffteilgehäuse (5) angeordnet ist. Um zu erreichen, daß das Griffteilgehäuse (5) des Flachschlüssels (1) klein gehalten werden kann und trotzdem ausreichend Platz für eine eventuell unterzubringende Elektronik vorhanden ist, schlägt die Erfindung vor, den Schlüsselbart (3) in seiner eingeklappten Stellung in einer außenseitigen Vertiefung (12) einer ersten Flachseite (13) des Gehäuses (5) unterzubringen und derart an dem Griffteilgehäuse (5) anzuordnen, daß er um eine sich in Richtung der Breitseite des Griffteilgehäuses (5) erstreckende Drehachse (10) in die ausgeklappte Stellung schwenkbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 19/04; A45C 11/32; E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/32 (2006.01); E05B 19/04 (2006.01); E05B 19/08 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00944 (2013.01); A45C 11/324 (2013.01); E05B 19/043 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00952 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070813 A1 20010124; DE 19933645 C1 20010906

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-03-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SICHERHEITSSYSTEME GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031106

2001-11-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI