Global Patent Index - EP 1070816 A1

EP 1070816 A1 2001-01-24 - Latch mechanism

Title (en)

Latch mechanism

Title (de)

Verriegelungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de verrouillage

Publication

EP 1070816 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00306056 A

Priority

GB 9917198 A

Abstract (en)

A latch mechanism(10) having a latch bolt(14) for releasably securing a striker in a closed position, the latch bolt being movably mounted on a chassis(16) of the latch mechanism, and a pawl(12) movably mounted on the chassis and engagable with the latch bolt to secure it in a closed position, the pawl and latch bolt each having respective pivot apertures and being movable about respective projections of the chassis extending through said respective pivot apertures, wherein at least one of said apertures and projections is tapered. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 65/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/04 (2013.01); E05B 85/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1070816 A1 20010124; EP 1070816 B1 20031029; DE 60006192 D1 20031204; DE 60006192 T2 20040617; GB 9917198 D0 19990922

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050717

2005-07-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050717

2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-07-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040714

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60006192 P 20031204

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FISHER, SIDNEY EDWARD

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLAND, TIMOTHY

2002-09-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARVINMERITOR LIGHT VEHICLE SYSTEMS (UK) LTD

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010223

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI